Watson v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Anita L Watson
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2021cv00440
Filed: October 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Leslie A Bowman
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2021 Filing 13 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Anita L Watson: Proof of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon OGC on 12/03/2021. (Osterhout, Karl)
December 9, 2021 Filing 12 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Anita L Watson: Proof of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon Attorney General on 12/06/2021. (Osterhout, Karl)
December 9, 2021 Filing 11 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Anita L Watson: Proof of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon U.S. Attorney on 12/06/2021. (Osterhout, Karl)
December 9, 2021 NOTICE of request for e-notices by Michael A. Ambri. (Ambri, Michael)
November 5, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Attorney General, Office of the Regional Counsel Commissioner of Social Security Administration and US Attorney. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(REM). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The plaintiff shall be responsible for service of the summons and complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie A Bowman on 11/4/2021. (ARC)
November 2, 2021 Filing 8 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
November 1, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Submitted by Anita L Watson. (Attachments: #1 Summons to OGC, #2 Summons to Attorney General)(Ayodele, Elizabeth)
November 1, 2021 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Karl E Osterhout on behalf of Plaintiff Anita L Watson. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
October 28, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #3 Summons Submitted filed by Anita L Watson. Summons submitted are missing the Plaintiff's name. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MCO)
October 28, 2021 Filing 4 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Leslie A Bowman. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-440-TUC-LAB. Magistrate Election form attached. (MCO)
October 28, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Anita L Watson. (Ayodele, Elizabeth) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(MCO)
October 28, 2021 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Anita L Watson. (Ayodele, Elizabeth) (MCO)
October 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Anita L Watson. (Ayodele, Elizabeth) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MCO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watson v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita L Watson
Represented By: Elizabeth Oluwafunmi Ayodele
Represented By: Karl E Osterhout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?