Stine v. Howard
Petitioner: Mikeal Glenn Stine
Respondent: Catricia Howard
Case Number: 4:2021cv00466
Filed: November 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: D Thomas Ferraro (PS)
Referring Judge: James A Soto
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2021 Filing 9 USCA Case Number re: #8 Notice of Appeal. Case number 21-17125, Ninth Circuit. (Copies sent by Ninth Circuit.) (KAH)
December 27, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals re: #7 Clerks Judgment, #6 Order Dismissing Case by Mikeal Glenn Stine. (1 page) (KAH)
December 13, 2021 Filing 7 CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Court's Order filed December 13, 2021, judgment of dismissal is entered. Petitioner to take nothing and this action is hereby dismissed. (JAM)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that Petitioner's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Doc. #2 ) is granted. Petitioner's Petition Under 28 U.S.C. 2241 (Doc. #1 ) and this case are dismissed. The Clerk of Court must enter judgment accordingly and close this case. Signed by Judge James A Soto on 12/10/21. (See attached Order for complete details)(JAM)
December 6, 2021 Filing 5 Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction in Habeas Case. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MCO)
November 17, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (JAM)
November 17, 2021 Filing 3 *AMENDED FILED AT DOC. #4 - NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (JAM) Modified on 11/17/2021 (JAM).
November 17, 2021 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Mikeal Glenn Stine. (2 pages) (JAM)
November 17, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Fed/2241) filed by Mikeal Glenn Stine. (10 pages) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stine v. Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mikeal Glenn Stine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Catricia Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?