Jackson v. Jimmienez et al
Plaintiff: Marcellus D K Jackson
Defendant: Adan Jimmienez, Unknwon Dickman, Unknown Hansen, Unknown Graciano and Unknown Dickman
Case Number: 4:2021cv00524
Filed: December 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Pro Se (Tucson)
Referring Judge: James A Soto
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2022 Filing 9 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Marcellus D K Jackson. (3 pages) (MYE)
January 24, 2022 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Marcellus D K Jackson. (2 pages) (MYE)
January 24, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE by Marcellus D K Jackson re: #5 Amended Complaint. (1 page) (MYE)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Plaintiff must either pay the $350.00 filing fee and $52.00 administrative fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and a certified six-month trust account statement. If Plaintiff fails to either pay the $350.00 filing fee and $52.00 administrative fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Plaintiff and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot. The Clerk of Court must mail Plaintiff a court-approved form for filing an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Non-Habeas). Signed by Judge James A Soto on 1/21/22. (MYE)
January 3, 2022 Filing 5 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Unknown Dickman, Unknown Graciano, Unknown Hansen, Adan Jimmienez filed by Marcellus D K Jackson. (24 pages) (Attachments: #1 Attachment Letter)(MYE)
December 30, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF PARTY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Marcellus D K Jackson: #275352, ASPC- Yuma- Dakota Unit, P.O. Box 8909, San Luis, AZ 85349. (2 pages) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MYE)
December 20, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF PARTY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Marcellus D K Jackson: #275352, TUCSON-AZ-TUCSON-ASPC-CIMARRON, PO BOX 24409, TUCSON, AZ 85734. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(SCA)
December 13, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (JAM)
December 13, 2021 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed by Marcellus D K Jackson. (21 pages) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Jimmienez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcellus D K Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adan Jimmienez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknwon Dickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Graciano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Dickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?