Pickering v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Michael Pickering
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2022cv00028
Filed: January 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline M Rateau
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2022 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Michael Pickering: Notice of Service re: Summons upon Merrick B. Garland, US Attorney General (3/1/2022); Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of the Social Security Administration (2/25/2022); Glenn McCormick, Acting US Attorney for the District of Arizona (2/25/2022) on 3/1/2022; 2/25/2022; 2/25/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Fern, Sarah)
February 28, 2022 NOTICE of request for e-notices by Michael A. Ambri. (Ambri, Michael)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER: (See attached Order for complete details) Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M Rateau on 1/24/2022. (MCO)
January 23, 2022 Filing 6 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DLC)
January 21, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration, United States Attorney General, and United States Attorney. (MYE). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
January 21, 2022 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-20268025. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Jacqueline M Rateau. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-28-TUC-JR. Magistrate Election form attached. (MYE)
January 21, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Michael Pickering. (Fern, Sarah) (MYE)
January 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-20268025 filed by Michael Pickering. (Fern, Sarah) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MYE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pickering v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Pickering
Represented By: Robin Michelle Larkin
Represented By: Sarah Nicole Fern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?