Lovelace v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Lovelace
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2022cv00051
Filed: January 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Maria S Aguilera
Referring Judge: John C Hinderaker
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2022 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. IT IS ORDERED this case is reassigned by random draw to District Judge John C Hinderaker. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-22-51-TUC-JCH. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DLC)
March 18, 2022 Filing 12 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DLC)
March 18, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: David Priddy appearing for Commissioner of Social Security Administration. . (Priddy, David)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER re Briefing Requirements Contained in LRCiv 16.1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria S Aguilera on 3/15/22. (See attached Order for complete details)(JAM)
February 25, 2022 NOTICE of request for e-notices by Michael A. Ambri. (Ambri, Michael)
February 17, 2022 Filing 7 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DLC)
February 17, 2022 Filing 5 Magistrate Election Form resent and deadline reset (x2). (DLC)
January 31, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (SCA). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
January 31, 2022 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-20295774. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Maria S. Aguilera. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-00051-TUC-MSA. Magistrate Election form attached. (SCA)
January 31, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Elizabeth Lovelace. (Miller, Audrey) (SCA)
January 31, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-20295774 filed by Elizabeth Lovelace. (Miller, Audrey) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SCA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lovelace v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Lovelace
Represented By: Audrey Corinne Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: David Priddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?