Garcia v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Aaron Garcia
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2022cv00065
Filed: February 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Maria S Aguilera
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The parties must fully comply with LRCiv 16.1 in its entirety. Within sixty (60) days after the answer is filed, Plaintiff must file an opening brief addressing why the Commissioners decision is not supported by substantial evidence or why the decision should otherwise be reversed or the case remanded. Defendant must file an answering brief within thirty (30) days after service of Plaintiff's opening brief. Plaintiff may file a reply brief within fifteen (15) days after service of Defendant's brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria S Aguilera on 3/15/22. (See attached Order for complete details.)(MYE)
March 10, 2022 NOTICE of request for e-notices by Michael A. Ambri. (Ambri, Michael)
March 2, 2022 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (SCA). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria S Aguilera on 03/02/2022. (SCA)
February 18, 2022 Filing 6 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DLC)
February 10, 2022 Filing 4 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Maria S Aguilera. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-65-TUC-MSA. Magistrate Election form attached. (ARC)
February 10, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Aaron Garcia. (Miller, Audrey)(ARC)
February 10, 2022 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Aaron Garcia. (Miller, Audrey)(ARC)
February 10, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Aaron Garcia.(Miller, Audrey) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ARC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Garcia
Represented By: Audrey Corinne Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?