Bagnell v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Hannah Bagnell
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2022cv00116
Filed: March 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Maria S Aguilera
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2022 Filing 13 Minute Order: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge Maria S Aguilera conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DLC)
April 22, 2022 Filing 12 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DLC)
April 22, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Michonne Omo appearing for Commissioner of Social Security Administration. . (Omo, Michonne)
April 11, 2022 NOTICE of request for e-notices by Michael A. Ambri. (Ambri, Michael)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Pursuant to LRCiv 16.2(b)(1)(B), the Court issues this Scheduling Order without holding a scheduling conference. IT IS ORDERED that the parties must fully comply with the deadlines and procedures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria S Aguilera on 4/4/2021. (See attached Order for complete details)(DLC)
April 4, 2022 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (DLC)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria S Aguilera on 4/4/2022. (DLC)
March 14, 2022 Filing 6 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DLC)
March 9, 2022 Filing 4 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Maria S Aguilera. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-116-TUC-MSA. Magistrate Election form attached. (MYE)
March 9, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Hannah Bagnell. (Miller, Audrey) (MYE)
March 9, 2022 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Hannah Bagnell. (Miller, Audrey) (MYE)
March 9, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Hannah Bagnell. (Miller, Audrey) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MYE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bagnell v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hannah Bagnell
Represented By: Audrey Corinne Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Michonne Louise Omo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?