Michael v. FCA US LLC
Plaintiff: Brittany Lynn Michael
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Case Number: 4:2022cv00254
Filed: May 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Raner C Collins
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2022 Filing 11 STATEMENT OF FACTS re: #10 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-7)(Fischer, C)
July 27, 2022 Filing 10 *MOTION for Summary Judgment by FCA US LLC. (Fischer, C) *Modified docket text to remove ex parte on 7/28/2022 (MYE).
July 26, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Brittany Lynn Michael. (Shumway, G)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that a Telephonic Case Management Conference is set for Tuesday, August 09, 2022 at 11:50 a.m. Signed by Senior Judge Raner C Collins on 6/22/22. (See attached Order for complete details)(JAM)
June 22, 2022 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FCA US LLC. (Fischer, C)
June 22, 2022 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by FCA US LLC.(Fischer, C)
June 6, 2022 Filing 5 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Brittany Lynn Michael: Affidavit of Service re: Complaint, Summons, Civil Cover Sheet upon FCA US LLC on June 1, 2022. (Shumway, G)
May 31, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to FCA US LLC. (JAM). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
May 31, 2022 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-20700645. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Raner C Collins. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-254-TUC-RCC. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (JAM)
May 31, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Brittany Lynn Michael. (Shumway, G) (JAM)
May 31, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number AAZDC-20700645 filed by Brittany Lynn Michael. (Shumway, G) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michael v. FCA US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany Lynn Michael
Represented By: Brent Michael Ghelfi
Represented By: G Lynn Shumway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: C Megan Fischer
Represented By: Thomas M Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?