Taylor v. Wal-Mart Stores Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Frances Taylor
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Incorporated and Walgreens Boots Alliance Incorporated
Case Number: 4:2022cv00329
Filed: July 27, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Raner C Collins
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint: Wal-Mart Stores Incorporated answer due 10/15/2022. Signed by Senior Judge Raner C Collins on 8/31/2022. (MCO)
August 30, 2022 Filing 12 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Wal-Mart Stores Incorporated. (Waterkotte, Grant)
August 30, 2022 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores Incorporated. (Waterkotte, Grant)
August 30, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Grant Daniel Waterkotte on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores Incorporated. (Waterkotte, Grant)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint : Walgreens Boots Alliance Incorporated answer due 10/15/2022. (See attached Order for complete details) Signed by Senior Judge Raner C Collins on 8/26/2022. (MCO)
August 25, 2022 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Walgreens Boots Alliance Incorporated. (Cullins, Douglas)
August 25, 2022 Filing 7 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Walgreens Boots Alliance Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to Extend Time to Answer Complaint)(Cullins, Douglas)
August 17, 2022 Filing 6 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Frances Taylor: Affidavit of Service re: Civil Cover Sheet, Summons, and Complaint upon Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. on 8/10/2022. (Smith, W)
August 5, 2022 Filing 5 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Frances Taylor: Affidavit of Service re: Civil Cover Sheet, Summons, and Complaint upon Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. on 8/4/2022. (Smith, W)
August 2, 2022 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for W Roger Smith on behalf of Plaintiff Frances Taylor. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
July 28, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Wal-Mart Stores Incorporated, Walgreens Boots Alliance Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(BAC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
July 27, 2022 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-20924460. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Senior Judge Raner C Collins. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-00329-TUC-RCC. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAC)
July 27, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Frances Taylor. (O'Steen, Jonathan) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(BAC)
July 27, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $402.00, receipt number AAZDC-20924460 filed by Frances Taylor. (O'Steen, Jonathan) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Related Actions)(BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Wal-Mart Stores Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances Taylor
Represented By: Jonathan Van O'Steen
Represented By: W Roger Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Incorporated
Represented By: Grant Daniel Waterkotte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Incorporated
Represented By: Douglas Robert Cullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?