Arellano v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Francisca Arellano
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2022cv00545
Filed: December 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Raner C Collins
Referring Judge: Eric J Markovich
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2023 Filing 18 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Francisca Arellano: Return of Service re: Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint, Summons upon United States Attorney for the District of Arizona on 01/10/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit US Postal Service Delivery Confirmation Receipt)(Phillips, John)
February 1, 2023 Filing 17 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Francisca Arellano: Return of Service re: Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint, Summons upon United States Attorney General on 01/17/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit US Postal Service Delivery Confirmation Receipt)(Phillips, John)
February 1, 2023 Filing 16 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Francisca Arellano: Return of Service re: Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint, Summons upon Social Security Administration on 01/09/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit US Postal Service Delivery Confirmation Receipt)(Phillips, John)
January 19, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Franco Becia appearing for Commissioner of Social Security Administration. . (Becia, Franco)
January 19, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE: Social Security Case Service. Pursuant to Rule 3 of the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. 405(g), the Clerk has issued a Notice of Electronic Case Filing (NEF) using the Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system, notifying the appropriate Regional Social Security Administration's Office of General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of the case. No summons shall issue. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MYE)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: The plaintiff must file and serve on the Commissioner a brief for the requested relief within 30 days after the answer is filed or 30 days after entry of an order disposing of the last remaining motion filed under Rule 4(c), whichever is later. The Commissioner must file a brief and serve it on the plaintiff within 30 days after service of the plaintiff's brief. The plaintiff may file a brief and serve it on the Commissioner within 14 days after service of the Commissioner's brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eric J Markovich on 1/18/23. (See attached Order for complete details.)(MYE)
January 19, 2023 NOTICE of request for e-notices by Michael A. Ambri. (Ambri, Michael)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Eric J Markovich for all pretrial proceedings and a Report and Recommendation in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1), Fed. R. Civ. P. 72, and 72.2 of the Rules of Practice of the United States District Court for the District of Arizona. All future filings in this case shall be designated: CV-22-00545-TUC-RCC (EJM). Signed by Senior Judge Raner C Collins on 12/13/22. (MYE)
December 13, 2022 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. IT IS ORDERED this case is reassigned by random draw to Senior Judge Raner C Collins. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-22-545-TUC-RCC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DLC)
December 13, 2022 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (MYE). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties must fully comply with LRCiv 16.1 in its entirety. Within sixty (60) days after the answer is filed, Plaintiff must file an opening brief addressing why the Commissioner's decision is not supported by substantial evidence or why the decision should otherwise be reversed or the case remanded. Defendant must file an answering brief within thirty (30) days after service of Plaintiff's opening brief. Plaintiff may file a reply brief within fifteen (15) days after service of Defendant's brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eric J Markovich on 12/13/22. (See attached Order for complete details.)(MYE)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDERED that Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Doc. #3 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eric J Markovich on 12/13/22. (MYE)
December 9, 2022 Filing 9 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DLC)
December 5, 2022 Filing 5 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Eric J Markovich. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-00545-TUC-EJM. Magistrate Election form attached. (MYE)
December 5, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Submitted by Francisca Arellano. (Phillips, John) (MYE)
December 5, 2022 Filing 3 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Francisca Arellano. (Phillips, John) (MYE)
December 5, 2022 Filing 2 **WRONG PDF Attached, Correct Document Refiled at Doc. #3 . Modified on 12/6/2022 (MYE).
December 5, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Francisca Arellano. (Phillips, John) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MYE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arellano v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisca Arellano
Represented By: John E Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Franco Becia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?