Johnson v. Maples et al

Plaintiff: Frederick Johnson
Defendant: Maples, Dixon, Cargil and Regina Basewell
Case Number: 1:2008cv00020
Filed: April 7, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Prison Condition: Civil Rights Office
County: Chicot
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 23, 2009 32 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 31 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations dismissing complaint without prejudice and denying relief sought. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/23/09. (bkp)
March 6, 2009 28 Opinion or Order of the Court PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS that Pltf's complaint 2 5 9 be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to comply with Local Rule 5.5(c)(2) and failure to prosecute; the Court certify that an ifp appeal taken the Order and Judgment dismissing this action is considered frivolous and not in good faith; Objections to R&R due by 3/20/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 3/6/09. (vjt) (Modified on 3/6/2009 to correct typographical error) (vjt).
November 17, 2008 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing service on Defendants by the U.S. Marshal; the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve a copy of the complaint (docket entry #2), amended complaints (docket entries #5 & #9), addendum (docket entry #10), this order, and summons, upon Defendants, without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 11/17/08. (mkf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Maples et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cargil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regina Basewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?