Eaton v. Inman

Plaintiff: Detina Eaton
Defendant: Inman
Case Number: 1:2008cv00030
Filed: May 27, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Prison Condition: Civil Rights Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 14, 2009 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 14 Recommended Disposition in its entirety; therefore, Pltf's complaint 2 is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to comply with Local Rule 5.5(c)(2); judgment will be entered accordingly. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/14/09. (vjt)
December 29, 2008 14 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that pltf's complt be dismissed without prejudice for failure to comply with LR 5.5(c)(2) 2 5 . The Court certify that an ifp appeal taken from the order and judgment dismissing this action be considered frivolous and not in good faith. Objections to R&R due by 1/12/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 12/29/2008. (lej)
October 20, 2008 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to change the style of the case to reflect the correct name of deft Thomas Inman and to prepare summons for the US Marshal to serve upon deft at his last known address, which is filed under seal in the Clerk's Office, a long with a copy of the complaint, amended complaint and this order. The Marshal is directed to send plaintiff's copy of process to the Clerk of the Court, who will remove the address prior to forwarding a copy to plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 10/20/08. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eaton v. Inman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Detina Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?