Wright v. Lane et al

Plaintiff: James Benjamin Wright
Defendant: Brandon K Lane, Curtis Mienzer, Eddie Selvey and Larry Jones
Case Number: 1:2008cv00040
Filed: July 3, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Prison Condition: Civil Rights Office
County: Izard
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 13, 2009 45 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of defts re 44 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations dismissing case with prejudice and certifying that an ifp appeal taken would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 7/13/09. (bkp)
June 26, 2009 41 Opinion or Order of the Court PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION recommending 35 Defendants' MOTION for Summary Judgment be granted, and this case be dismissed, with prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 7/10/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 6/26/09. (hph)
February 26, 2009 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 30 Partial Report and Recommendations and denying 25 Motion for Protective Order filed by James Benjamin Wright, and certifying that an ifp appeal from any Order adopting this Recommended Partial Disposition would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 2/26/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright v. Lane et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Benjamin Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon K Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis Mienzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eddie Selvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?