Boyd v. Armstrong et al
Plaintiff: Alvester Boyd, III
Defendant: Shelia Armstrong, Todd Ball, Billy Cowell, Wendy Kelly and J Maples
Case Number: 1:2008cv00043
Filed: August 22, 2008
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Prison Condition: Civil Rights Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: Jerry W. Cavaneau
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 33 JUDGMENT re 32 Order on Report and Recommendations dismissing complaint without prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/27/09. (bkp)
February 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 27 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that pltf's complt be dismissed without prejudice for failure to comply with LR 5.5(c)(2), and for failure to respond to the Court's order 2 6 . The Court certify that an ifp appeal taken from the order and judgment dismissing this action is considered frivolous and not in good faith. Objections to R&R due by 2/23/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 2/9/2009. (lej)
December 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER ADOPTING 14 Partial Report and Recommendations dismissing claims against defts Kelly, May, Baswell, Norris, Maples and Heier without prejudice. Service is appropriate for defts Cowell, Ball and Armstrong and the Clerk is directed to prepare the summons and the U.S. Marshal to serve summons, complaint and amended complaint with any attachments upon the remaining defts. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/9/08. (bkp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boyd v. Armstrong et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvester Boyd, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelia Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billy Cowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Maples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?