Miller/Perry v. Arkansas Department of Correction et al

Plaintiff: Frances Renee Miller/Perry
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Correction, Sara Sallas, Kelly Dyer, Judy Taylor and John Maples, Sr
Case Number: 1:2009cv00025
Filed: May 20, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Jackson
Referring Judge: Henry L. Jones
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 28, 2009 37 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 36 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations and denying the relief sought. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 8/28/09. (bkp)
August 20, 2009 32 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending defts' motion to dismiss be granted and pltf's complaint against defts be dismissed 20 ; Objections to R&R due by 9/3/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 8/20/09. (tjj)
July 8, 2009 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 8 Partial Report and Recommendations dismissing deft Arkansas Department of Correction. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 7/8/09. (bkp)
June 18, 2009 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons and the U.S. Marshal to serve defts with the complaint and amended complaint and summons in care of ADC Compliance Division, P.O. Box 20550, Pine Bluff, AR 71612-0550 without prepayment of costs therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 6/18/09. (bkp)
May 26, 2009 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the plaintiff to submit either the $350 statutory filing fee or an ifp application within 30 days of the entry date of this Order; and directing the Clerk to send to plaintiff an ifp application, together with the filing fee calculation sheet. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 5/26/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller/Perry v. Arkansas Department of Correction et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances Renee Miller/Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara Sallas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Dyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judy Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Maples, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?