Defoor v. Dowell et al

Plaintiff: James Defoor
Defendant: Rhonda Dowell, Richard Sheppard and Robert Barnett
Case Number: 1:2009cv00028
Filed: May 28, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Independence
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Referring Judge: Henry L. Jones
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 1, 2010 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part defts' motion for summary judgment with respect to all claims except pltf's Eighth Amendment mental health claim 27 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 4/1/10. (tjj)
February 22, 2010 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 44 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying 46 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 2/22/10. (bkp)
January 26, 2010 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 40 Notice (construed as a Motion to Re-Open by the Court filed by Mike James Defoor and directing the Clerk to re-open the case and the defts to file a reply to pltf's response to the pending summary judgment motion within 10 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 1/26/10. (bkp)
November 30, 2009 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the plaintiff to file a response to the 27 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by defts within ten days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 11/30/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Defoor v. Dowell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Defoor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhonda Dowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Barnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?