Hardy et al v. Bartmess

Plaintiff: James Hardy, Jr, Hardy Resources LLC, B&H Resources LLC, Mary Hardy, Hardy Energy Services Inc, Elite Coil Tubing Solutions LLC, Northstar Farms LLC and John Hardy
Defendant: George Bartmess
Counter_claimant: George Bartmess
Counter_defendant: Elite Coil Tubing Solutions LLC, Northstar Farms LLC, John Hardy, James Hardy, Jr, Hardy Resources LLC, B&H Resources LLC, Mary Hardy and Hardy Energy Services Inc
Case Number: 1:2009cv00041
Filed: March 16, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 2, 2015 348 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Status Report, 347 , noted and appreciated. The hearing set for 20 January 2016 is canceled. The show cause Order, 346 , is discharged. The Hardy Interests have complied with the Court's delivery Order. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/2/2015. (jak)
November 23, 2015 346 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing James Hardy Jr. and B&H Resources LLC to appear and show cause why they should not be held in contempt for disobeying the Court's October 19 Order. The hearing will be held at 9:00 a.m. on 20 January 2016 in Courtroom B-155 of th e Richard Sheppard Arnold United States Courthouse, 500 West Capitol Avenue, Little Rock, Arkansas 72201. Swazk may attend by telephone. If deeds are delivered before the hearing, Bartmess must immediately notify the Court. If the deeds are not delivered beforehand, Mr. Hardy's lawyer must bring them to the hearing. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/23/2015. (jak)
October 19, 2015 344 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying the motion to recuse after oral argument at the 23 July 2015 hearing. The Court directs the Hardys' new lawyer to deliver the approved warranty deeds to Bartmess's lawyer - with a caveat. Bartmess has pressed for the deeds wit h full knowledge of the existing liens on the 377 and the 686; she's accepting delivery with that knowledge; she is therefore estopped to assert any violation of the deeds' warranties by the Hardy interests as to the existing liens. Notic e of receipt from Bartmess due by 30 October 2015. the 340 show case order is discharged. Suggestion of bankruptcy, 343 noted. The case is stayed as to Elite Coil Tubing Solutions LLC, only. Status reports from the Hardy Interests on the involunt ary proceeding due by 22 January 2016. The Court endorses the parties' views that bringing some or all of the three related cases together before one judge now makes good sense. It remains to the parties, though, to seek any transfer. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/19/2015. (jak)
April 24, 2015 336 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court orders Bartmess's lawyer to provide the Court-approved deed on the 377, and the Court-approved deed on the 686 (revised to cover the minerals only), to John Hardy and the lawyer for Evergreen Processing LLC by 27 April 2015. The Court orders Evergreen Processing LLC and its managing member, John Hardy, to execute the Court-approved deed on the 377 and the Court-approved deed on the 686 (revised to cover the minerals only), and deliver both to Bartmess's lawyer by 15 Ma y 2015. Szwak's motion to be relieved as counsel for the Hardys and their entities, 324 is granted with a caveat. For good cause shown, Szwak is relieved as counsel for James Hardy Jr., Mary Hardy, and John Hardy effective immediately. The Cou rt orders Hardy Resources LLC, Hardy Energy Services, Inc., Elite Coil Tubing Solutions, LLC, Northstar Farms, LLC, and Evergreen Processing, LLC to secure substitute counsel immediately. Substitute counsel for each of the Hardy entities shall appear in this case by 15 May 2015. Szwak will be relieved from representing the Hardy entities when new counsel appears. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/24/2015. (jak)
April 21, 2015 334 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court has been informed that Ms. Hardy is unable to attend the 24 April 2015 hearing. Ms. Hardy, Mr. John Hardy, and Mr. Szwak must contact chambers to obtain the instructions for attending by telephone. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/21/2015. (jak)
April 3, 2015 325 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court will find a mutually convenient date and set a status conferring hearing by separate notice. Mr. Szwak may attend by telephone or in person, at his choice. He should file under seal a supporting addendum to his motion, 324 , by 10 A pril 2015. James Hardy, Jr., John Hardy, Mary Hardy (if she is able), and a corporate representative from each of the Hardy entities remaining in the case (Hardy Resources, LLC; Hardy Energy Services, Inc.; Elite Coil Tubing Solutions, LLC; Northstar Farms, LLC; and Evergreen Processing, LLC) must attend the hearing in person. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/3/2015. (jak)
December 23, 2014 321 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 320 Motion. The Hardy Interests must file notice by 2 January 2015 of providing to Bartmess a copy of the assignment of sand to Celtic Bank. If they do not, the Court will consider issuing a show case Order. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/23/2014. (jak)
November 17, 2014 319 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 318 Motion. The deadline for closing is extended until 16 January 2015. Joint report on closing due by 31 January 2015. The Hardy Interests should go ahead and provide Bartmess a copy of the assignment o f sand to Celtic Bank, if this hasn't been done already. The request for consolidation with new case 4:14-cv-666 is denied. The extended deadlines should provide time to sort the other case out as part of the closing in this case. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/17/2014. (jak)
November 7, 2014 317 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the parties to close their transactions as soon as possible and no later than 12 December 2014. The parties should file a joint report to the Court by 19 December 2014. The proposed warranty deed on the 377 and the 686 - Exhibit A to 313 - is approved. The proposed release deed from First National Bank of Izard County - Exhibit B to 313 - is approved. The proposed release deed from the Celtic Bank Corporation - Exhibit C to 313 is approved. The reciprocal waiver - Exhibit 3 to 316 - is approved. The Court denies Bartmess's request for some kind of document warranting that no other liens or encumbrances exist, 313 . Bartmess's reasonable request for a copy of the assignment of sand to Celtic Bank is granted. If the Hardy Interests have not already done so, they must provide a copy by 14 November 2014. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/7/2014. (jak)
September 16, 2014 311 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Bartmess to advise the Hardy Interests of her decision on the repurchase option on the surface rights to the 686 by 7 October 2014. Thereafter, Bartmess shall prepare deeds conforming to this Order and her decision for the Hardy Inter ests' consideration. The deeds shall be presented to the Court for approval by 24 October 2014. Motion to enforce, 288 , granted in part and denied in part. Given both sides have prevailed in part, the Court declines to award any attorney's fees. The 310 Motion to Withdraw is denied without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/16/2014. (jak)
December 9, 2013 305 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting unopposed 301 Motion for Leave to File 301 Motion to Strike and Motion to Seal Document 302 . The Clerk shall file Exhibit S-1 under seal when the Hardys submit it. The Court directs the parties not to file anything else now. Are counsel available on December 18th at 3:00 p.m. or December 19th at 8:30 a.m. for a status conference? Please advise chambers. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/9/13. (kpr)
March 5, 2012 274 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 271 Motion for Attorney Fees. Honea and Rush are allowed expert fees in the total of $575.00 and $5000 is allowed for attorneys' fees. The Hardys must file confirmation of payment by March 20, 2012. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/5/12. (kpr)
January 18, 2012 263 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 262 Order dismissing the Hardy entities' active complaint and Bartmess's counterclaim with prejudice, pursuant to a settlement agreement reached by the parties. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/18/12. (kpr)
October 25, 2011 207 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as moot 203 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. The Amended Final Scheduling Order is modified as set forth in this Order. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/25/11. (kpr)
September 26, 2011 201 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER accepting in part and declining granting in part 178 Partial Report and Recommendations and granting in part and denying in part 94 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; denying 169 Motion for Leave to File and declining 190 Partial Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/26/11. (kpr)
February 28, 2011 126 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting deft's motion to file exhibits under seal 97 ; denying pltfs' first motion to strike 101 ; pltfs' motion for "leave to seal and file under seal exhibits to motion to strike and objections to proposed exhibits offe red by deft in connection with motion for judgment on the pleadings" is granted 102 ; denying pltfs' second motion to strike 107 ; deft's motion to substitute and file substituted Exhibit 1-A under seal is granted 116 . Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 2/28/11. (vjt)
February 17, 2011 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 105 Motion to Substitute Helen Bartmess, Executrix of the Estate of George Bartmess, as a party to this proceeding in place of George Bartmess, deceased. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 2/17/11. (vjt)
November 3, 2010 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Bartmess' 78 Motion to Compel and pltfs' 82 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 11/3/10. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hardy et al v. Bartmess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Hardy, Jr
Represented By: David Anthony Szwak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hardy Resources LLC
Represented By: David Anthony Szwak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B&H Resources LLC
Represented By: David Anthony Szwak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Hardy
Represented By: David Anthony Szwak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hardy Energy Services Inc
Represented By: David Anthony Szwak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elite Coil Tubing Solutions LLC
Represented By: David Anthony Szwak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northstar Farms LLC
Represented By: David Anthony Szwak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Hardy
Represented By: David Anthony Szwak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Bartmess
Represented By: M. Blair Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: George Bartmess
Represented By: M. Blair Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Elite Coil Tubing Solutions LLC
Represented By: David Anthony Szwak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Northstar Farms LLC
Represented By: David Anthony Szwak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: John Hardy
Represented By: David Anthony Szwak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: James Hardy, Jr
Represented By: David Anthony Szwak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Hardy Resources LLC
Represented By: David Anthony Szwak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: B&H Resources LLC
Represented By: David Anthony Szwak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Mary Hardy
Represented By: David Anthony Szwak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Hardy Energy Services Inc
Represented By: David Anthony Szwak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?