Davis v. Correctional Medical Services Inc et al

Plaintiff: LaToyin V Davis
Defendant: Correctional Medical Services Inc, Selvey and Holloway
Case Number: 1:2009cv00045
Filed: September 8, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Izard
Referring Judge: Henry L. Jones
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 31, 2011 182 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 181 Motion for Bill of Costs and ordering the Clerk of the Court to distribute to Dover Dixon Horne PLLC, the amount of $6,317.86 from the Reimbursement of Out-of-Pocket Fund. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 3/31/11. (kpr)
March 24, 2011 180 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 179 Memorandum And Order dismissing the case with prejudice and denying the relief sought. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 3/24/11. (kpr)
July 9, 2010 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER appointing attorney Joi Leonard, 120 East Fourth Street, Little Rock, AR 72201-2893, to represent plaintiff in all further proceedings; and directing the Clerk to provide counsel and plaintiff with a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/9/10. (bkp)
June 18, 2010 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing defts to file responses to plaintiff's 103 MOTION to Compel and 105 MOTION for Order within ten days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 6/18/10. (bkp)
April 16, 2010 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 64 Motion to Dismiss and dismissing CMS, Inc. as a party defendant to this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 4/16/10. (bkp)
February 22, 2010 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare summons for deft Correctional Medical Services, Inc., and the United States Marshal to serve a copy of the complaint and summons on defts in care of Humphries and Lewis Law Firm, P.O. Box 20670, White Hall, AR 71612, without prepayment of fees therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 2/22/10. (bkp)
December 3, 2009 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING in part 10 Partial Report and Recommendations and dismissing deft Arkansas Department of Correction for plaintiff's failure to state a claim. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/3/09. (bkp) (Docket text modified on 12/7/2009 to correct the description of the document filed.) (thd)
November 19, 2009 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 27 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment filed by LaToyin V Davis; the Court construes this document as an additional objection to this Court's October 1, 2009 Partial Report and Recommendation, and directs that it be docketed as such. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 11/19/09. (mkf)
October 19, 2009 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons for defts Nurse Hunt and Nurse Lafevers and the U.S. Marshal to serve defts in care of Humphries & Lewis Law Firm, P.O. Box 20670, White Hall, AR 71612, without prepayment of costs therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 10/19/09. (bkp)
October 1, 2009 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that the Clerk prepare summons for defts and the U.S. Marshal to serve a copy of the original and amended complaints and summons on defts without prepayment of costs therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr. on 10/1/09. (bkp) (Docket entry modified on 10/5/2009 to correct the signing Judge, the signature date, and the file date.) (thd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Correctional Medical Services Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaToyin V Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Medical Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?