Miller/Perry v. Anderson et al
Plaintiff: Frances Renee Miller/Perry
Defendant: Donald Anderson and Correctional Medical Services
Case Number: 1:2009cv00065
Filed: November 30, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Batesville Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: Henry L. Jones
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER granting 113 Motion for Reimbursement of out-of-pocket expenses filed by Plaintiff's appointed counsel. The Clerk of the Court is directed to distribute to Broadaway & Broadaway P.A. the amount of $775.74. A copy of this Order, together with the application, shall be placed in the Fund file maintained by the Clerk of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 1/10/2012. (jct)
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 112 JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 111 Memorandum and Order entered in this matter on this date, It is Considered, Ordered and Adjudged that this case be, and it is hereby, DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 12/19/2011. (dmn)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER directing pltf's court-appointed attorneys to respond to pltf's pro se MOTION to Withdraw 79 within 10 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 6/9/11. (vjt)
October 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER denying 60 Motion to Compel without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/15/10. (bkp)
October 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting 49 Motion for Summary Judgment and dismissing plaintiff's claim against deft Dunavion without prejudice; finding as moot 62 Motion to Deem Admitted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/14/10. (bkp)
August 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER denying as moot 53 Motion to Compel and directing the plaintiff to file a response to deft Dunavion's motion for summary judgment within 10 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 8/17/10. (bkp)
April 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER rejecting 9 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare summons for defts Marry Matthews/Decker and Correctional Medical Services, and the U.S. Marshal to serve defts in care of Humphries and Lewis Law Firm, P.O. Box 20670, White Hall, AR 71612, without prepayment of costs therefor. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/14/10. (bkp)
March 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER directing that the Clerk issue summonses for defts Dunavion and Forkum and the U.S. Marshal to serve summons, original and amended complaints upon these defts without prepayment of fees therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 3/24/10. (bkp)
February 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that service is appropriate for the defts Anderson, Tiner, Dunavion, Wayland, Forkum and Lavendar and directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare summons and the United States Marshal to serve a copy of the original and amended complaints and summons on defts in care of Humphries and Lewis Law Firm, P.O. Box 20670, White Hall, AR 71612, without prepayment of costs therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 2/22/10. (bkp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller/Perry v. Anderson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances Renee Miller/Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Medical Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?