Beth v. Dolgencorp Inc et al

Plaintiff: Katherine Beth
Defendant: Dolgencorp Inc, Dollar General Partners, Dolgencorp of Texas Inc and Dolgencorp of New York Inc
Case Number: 1:2010cv00024
Filed: April 21, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 16, 2011 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 47 Joint MOTION for Stay, or Continuance of all deadlines in these cases; deft is directed to file the motion for summary judgment no later than the close of business on 7/6/11; all deadlines previously set are stayed for 60 days following the Court's ruling on said motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 6/16/11. (vjt)
March 25, 2011 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing parties to file a short status report by 4/11/11 regarding status of discovery in these cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 3/25/11. (vjt)
January 19, 2011 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER pursuant to 43 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by the parties in this matter, the claims against defts Dolgencorp of New York Inc, Dolgencorp of Texas Inc, and Dollar General Partners are dismissed and the Clerk is directed to show those defts as terminated in all the consolidated Dolgencorp cases for which this case is the LEAD CASE; Dollar General Partners, Dolgencorp of New York Inc and Dolgencorp of Texas Inc terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 1/19/11. (vjt)
December 1, 2010 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR CONSOLIDATION consolidating these 32 cases for filings and discovery purposes only; designating 1:10-cv-00024-JEG as the LEAD CASE; directing that all subsequent filings must be filed in the lead case only, and must be electronic, utilizing the Courts CM/ECF system; all counsel of record must register on CM/ECF; the Clerk is directed to annotate the docket sheets for the 31 related cases to state that the docket sheet for the lead case reflects all filings common to all 32 cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 12/1/10. (vjt)
October 13, 2010 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding preparations for status conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 10/13/10. (vjt)
May 28, 2010 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 20 Motion to Stay. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/28/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beth v. Dolgencorp Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dolgencorp Inc
Represented By: Joel S. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dollar General Partners
Represented By: Joel S. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dolgencorp of Texas Inc
Represented By: Joel S. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dolgencorp of New York Inc
Represented By: Joel S. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Beth
Represented By: Jere L. Beasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?