Dorsey v. Page et al

Plaintiff: Daniel Dorsey
Defendant: Joe Page, John Heir and Timme Loggains
Case Number: 1:2010cv00046
Filed: June 28, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 14, 2011 62 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 61 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations and dismissing the case with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 6/14/11. (kpr)
January 6, 2011 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 44 Partial Report and Recommendations and granting 42 Motion to Dismiss Party filed by Joe Page, Timme Loggains and dismissing deft Heier with prejudice from this action. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 1/6/11. (bkp)
August 27, 2010 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to amend the docket sheet to reflect that deft Loggains is "Timmie Loggains," and directing the parties to complete discovery on or before November 26, 2010 and to file any dispositive motions on or before December 28, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 8/27/10. (bkp)
August 2, 2010 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 5 Partial Report and Recommendations dismissing plaintiff's inhumane conditions of confinement claim without prejudice and allowing plaintiff to proceed with his excessive force claim; and certifying that an ifp appeal taken fro m this Order would not be taken in good faith; directing the Clerk to prepare summons and the U.S. Marshal to serve the summons, complaint and this Order on defts Page, Heir and Loggains without prepayment of fees therefor. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 8/2/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dorsey v. Page et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Dorsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Page
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Heir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timme Loggains
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?