Warren v. Tim

Plaintiff: Alton Warren
Defendant: Tim
Case Number: 1:2010cv00077
Filed: September 23, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Jackson
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 12, 2011 37 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT : Consistent with the Order that was entered on this day, Judgment is rendered in favor of Defendant Roger Tims and against Plaintiff Alton Warren. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 8/12/11. (hph)
April 19, 2011 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 16 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court filed by Alton Warren is hereby denied. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 4/19/11. (vjt)
February 1, 2011 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 13 Plaintiff's MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION for Hearing. If and when the Court determines that a hearing is necessary, the Court will issue a transport order to secure Plaintiff's appearance at any such hearing. Dispos itive motions may be filed on or before 6/1/2011. Absent the filing of dispositive motions, the Court will appoint counsel for Plaintiff & notify Judge Susan Webber Wright that a jury trial setting on her docket is appropriate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 2/1/2011. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Warren v. Tim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alton Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?