Edwards v. Arkansas Department of Correction

Plaintiff: Darrell Edwards
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Correction
Case Number: 1:2010cv00078
Filed: October 5, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Jackson
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 22, 2011 52 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 51 Order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered dismissing this action without prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 11/22/11. (vjt)
September 7, 2011 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff shall file, within thirty days of the entry of the Order, a Response to docket entry # 41 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Amanda Richardson, Ashley Bagwell and a separate Statement of Disputed Facts that comply with the Fed . R. Civ. P. 56, Local Rule 56.1, and the instructions set forth in this Order. Failure to timely and properly comply with this Order will result in: (a) all of the facts set forth in Defendants' summary judgment papers being deemed admitted by Plaintiff, pursuant to Local Rule 56.1(c); or (b) the dismissal of this action, without prejudice, pursuant to Local Rule 5.5(c)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 09/07/2011. (kcs)
January 26, 2011 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 18 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in their entirety; therefore, deft ADC Medical Staff is VOLUNTARILY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, and pltf shall proceed with his inadequate medical care claims against defts Baswell and Richardson; the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve summons, complaints 2 16 , and this Order on defts without prepayment of fees and costs. ADC Medical Staff terminated. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/26/11. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards v. Arkansas Department of Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?