Wilson v. Cockrill et al
Plaintiff: John Paul Wilson
Defendant: Alan Cockrill, John Ferguson, Melissa Hood, Jared Branscum and Stephanie Ringer
Case Number: 1:2010cv00103
Filed: December 14, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Batesville Office
County: Independence
Presiding Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER AND JUDGMENT granting 68 Plaintiff's Motion for Voluntary Dismissal; this cause is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 11/5/2012. (srw)
April 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part 47 Defendant Branscum's Motion for Summary Judgment; and dismissing the damages claims against him in his official capacity; and denying in part all other aspects of the Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 4/25/2012. (srw)
May 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND PARTIAL RECOMMENDATIONS 12 and dismissing defts Cockrill, Ferguson, Hood and Ringer for plaintiff's failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 5/5/11. (kpr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Cockrill et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Paul Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Cockrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jared Branscum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Ringer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?