Vanpelt v. Oxner et al

Plaintiff: Mario Keith Vanpelt
Defendant: Jack Oxner and James Guynes
Case Number: 1:2011cv00019
Filed: March 7, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Jefferson
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 19, 2014 171 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with the 170 Order that was entered on this day, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this case is dismissed. Plaintiff Mario Keith Vanpelt's claims against defendants Jack Oxner and James Guynes are dismissed with prejudice. Mr. Vanpelt's claims against defendants Corizon, LLC, Christi Taylor, Marybeth Floyd, Dr. Don Ball, and Quibble Butler are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 08/19/2014. (rhm)
January 8, 2014 136 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 135 Motion for Reconsideration. Dispositive motions are now due on or before 4/14/2014. No further extensions will be granted absent exceptional circumstances. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 1/8/2014. (ks)
May 30, 2013 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 103 Partial Report and Recommendations of Magistrate Judge, granting separate defendant Don W. Ball's 99 Motion to Dismiss Party. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 5/30/2013. (mcz)
October 25, 2012 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 72 Motion for Reconsideration re 67 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations; denying 73 Supplemental Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/25/12. (kpr)
September 12, 2012 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltf's 84 Motion to Amend Complaint; defts' 43 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED as moot, without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 9/12/12. (vjt)
July 6, 2012 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 76 Motion to Quash a subpoena re deposition of Larry Norris. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 7/6/12. (kpr)
April 25, 2012 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 57 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, pltf's 55 MOTION to Amend Complaint is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/25/12. (vjt)
February 24, 2012 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting defts' 39 Motion to Extend Time to File Motions; Dispositive Motions due by 3/2/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 2/24/12. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vanpelt v. Oxner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Keith Vanpelt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Oxner
Represented By: Robert L. Beard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Guynes
Represented By: Robert L. Beard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?