Ivy et al v. Avey et al

Plaintiff: Thomas Ivy and Carol Ivy
Defendant: Stacey Avey, Dan Brown, Betty Brown and Stone County, Arkansas
Case Number: 1:2011cv00034
Filed: April 26, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Stone
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 10, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 27 motion for attorney's fees. Plaintiffs are awarded $1828.00 in attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 2/10/2014. (mmd)
August 27, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND JUDGMENT in favor of Carol Ivy, Thomas Ivy against Betty Brown, Dan Brown 21 22 in the amount of $3,900.00, together with post-judgment interest at the maximum rate permitted by law from the date of the judgment until paid. T he Court reserves ruling on the amount of costs and fees to which plaintiffs are entitled and directs plaintiffs to submit a motion within 10 business days of this Order in support of their request for costs and fees. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/27/13. (kpr)
August 15, 2012 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 15 MOTION for Default Judgment against Betty Brown, Dan Brown filed by Thomas Ivy. The motion is referred to the Clerk for consideration. The Court will consider the motion for default judgment, if a Clerk's default is entered. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/15/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ivy et al v. Avey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Ivy
Represented By: Kent Tester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Ivy
Represented By: Kent Tester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacey Avey
Represented By: Jason E. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betty Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stone County, Arkansas
Represented By: Jason E. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?