Tucker et al v. Southwestern Energy Company et al

Plaintiff: James Tucker and Mindy Tucker
Defendant: BHP Billiton Petroleum (Fayetteville) LLC, Southwestern Energy Company, XTO Energy Inc and Chesapeake Energy Corporation
Case Number: 1:2011cv00044
Filed: May 17, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Cleburne
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 29, 2012 151 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 150 Order dismissing claims against XTO Energy without prejudice. All claims against the other defts are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/29/12. (kpr)
July 11, 2012 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 131 Motion for Ruling; finding as moot 135 Motion to Amend/Correct; finding as moot 136 Motion to Strike ; finding as moot 138 Motion to Strike. An amended final scheduling order will issue soon. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/11/12. (kpr)
June 14, 2012 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting forth the particulars of the telephone conference on June 14, 2012. The Amended Scheduling Order's ddls about experts are revised, as set forth in this Order. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/14/12. (kpr)
June 6, 2012 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 100 Motion to Dismiss Party; finding as moot 106 Motion to Stay. Discovery stay as to BHP is lifted. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/6/12. (kpr)
May 17, 2012 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing all of the plaintiff's claims against deft Chesapeake with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/17/12. (kpr)
May 11, 2012 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER taking under advisement 106 plaintiff's emergency motion to Stay consideration of BHP Billiton's motion to dismiss; granting 107 Motion to Quash; and cancelling the deposition noticed for May 14, 2012. Pltfs should respond to BHP Billiton's motion by May 21, 2012, with BHP Billiton's reply being due seven calendar days after pltfs respond. BHP Billiton should file an expedited response to the motion to stay consideration of the motion to dismiss by May 21, 2012. Pltfs' reply is due seven calendar days after BHP Billiton responds. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/11/12. (kpr)
April 6, 2012 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 85 Order concerning recusal. The Court is not disqualified from sitting and there is no good reason for me to recuse. I will therefore continue in the case. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/6/12. (kpr)
February 17, 2012 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 39 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 47 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 49 Motion to Dismiss; denying 76 Motion for Order. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/17/12. (kpr)
December 16, 2011 79 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/16/11. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tucker et al v. Southwestern Energy Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BHP Billiton Petroleum (Fayetteville) LLC
Represented By: David D. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwestern Energy Company
Represented By: Paul M. Bohannon
Represented By: Michael D. Morfey
Represented By: R. Scott Morgan
Represented By: G. Alan Perkins
Represented By: James D. Rankin, III
Represented By: Craig L. Stahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XTO Energy Inc
Represented By: Russell R. Barton
Represented By: Robert M. Honea
Represented By: Andrew D. Sims
Represented By: Tennessee W. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chesapeake Energy Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Tucker
Represented By: Michael P. McGartland
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Represented By: Paul Berry Cooper, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mindy Tucker
Represented By: Paul Berry Cooper, III
Represented By: John R. Holton
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: Michael P. McGartland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?