Nutt v. Correctional Medical Services et al

Plaintiff: Charlotte Marie Nutt
Defendant: Allison, Reed, Jim Lytle, Rory Griffith, Pratt, Donald Anderson, Tiner, McGinnis, McCoy, Correctional Medical Services and Wheeler
Case Number: 1:2011cv00065
Filed: July 29, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Pulaski
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 17, 2013 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the plaintiff to file a motion for service on deft Reid on or before 2/29/13, that includes a valid personal address where Ms. Reid can be served with process. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 1/17/13. (kpr)
December 17, 2012 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 97 the proposed findings and recommended partial disposition; granting 83 91 defendants Bobbie Allison, Donald Anderson, Mary McCoy, Stacy McGinnis, James Pratt, Janet Tiner, Elizabeth Wheeler, and John Lytle's motions for summary judgment; and dismissing without prejudice all claims against defendants Allison, Anderson, McCoy, McGinnis, Pratt, Tiner, Wheeler, and Lytle. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/17/2012. (kdr)
September 18, 2012 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the U.S. Marshal to re-serve summons and complaint on deft Reid without prepayment of fees and costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 9/18/12. (vjt)
November 29, 2011 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to correct name of deft Rory Griffin; the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve summons, complaint 2 , and this Order on deft Griffin without prepayment of fees and costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 11/29/11. (vjt)
October 18, 2011 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Magistrate Judge Beth Deere's proposed findings and recommended partial disposition; and dismissing Ms. Nutt's claims against defendant Correctional Medical Services, without prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/18/11. (hph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nutt v. Correctional Medical Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Lytle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rory Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McGinnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Medical Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlotte Marie Nutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?