Waller v. Maples et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth L Waller, Jr
Defendant: Raylina Ramsey, Nicholas C Naracon, John Maples, Jr and Joe Page, III
Case Number: 1:2011cv00069
Filed: August 22, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Batesville Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 JUDGMENT re 38 Order dismissing the complaint without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/7/12. (kpr)
December 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER ADOPTING 27 Partial Report and Recommendations and overruling Waller's objection. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/27/11. (kpr)
September 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER adopting 8 Partial Recommended Disposition and denying 4 Waller's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/14/2011. (dmn)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Waller v. Maples et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raylina Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas C Naracon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Maples, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Page, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth L Waller, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?