Sargent et al v. Hethrington et al

Plaintiff: Mary Sargent, Jennifer Mross and Tina M Emerson
Defendant: Timothy J Hethrington and Stephens
Case Number: 1:2012cv00017
Filed: February 6, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 2, 2013 75 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 74 Order entered in this case, all claims by all plaintiffs are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/2/2013. (dmn)
February 5, 2013 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 59 Defendants' Motion to Stay. Defendants must file any dispositive motion on or before 3/8/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 02/05/2013. (kcs)
December 6, 2012 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 52 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend/Correct; denying 53 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 12/06/2012. (kcs)
July 19, 2012 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 33 Partial Report and Recommendations denying 30 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/19/12. (kpr)
April 6, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting motion to proceed in forma pauperis 5 ; denying motions for discovery 4 9 ; denying motion for inquiry 10 ; and denying motions for summary judgment and default judgment, 14 15 without prejudice. The Clerk is directed to sty le Document 11-1 as Sargent's amended complaint. The Clerk is further directed to prepare a summons for Hethrington and Stephens and the U.S. Marshal shall serve the summons, Sargent's amended complaint, and this order on them without prepayment of fees therefore. Defts Emerson and Mross are dismissed as plaintiffs. The Court certifies that an ifp would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/6/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sargent et al v. Hethrington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Sargent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Mross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina M Emerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy J Hethrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?