Jones et al v. West Plains Bank & Trust Company et al
Plaintiff: David Lynn Jones and Skunk Deville Music
Defendant: West Plains Bank & Trust Company and Roger Thompson
Case Number: 1:2012cv00052
Filed: June 12, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Batesville Office
County: Sharp
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER denying 268 joint motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/27/2017. (cmn)
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 199 AMENDED JUDGMENT: Pursuant to Rule 59(e) and Rule 60(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Court enters this amended judgment, clarifying that the 188 Opinion and Order entered on February 5, 2015, finding plaintiff's claim of copyr ight is dismissed with prejudice, includes both the Court's 123 Order entered on March 26, 2014, and the 165 Memorandum Opinion and Order entered on August 27, 2014. This judgment is final under Rule 54(b). Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/25/2015. (ks)
February 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 189 JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 165 Memorandum and Order entered in this matter on August 27, 2014, plaintiff's claim of copyright infringement is dismissed with prejudice. This judgment is final under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54(b). Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/5/2015. (ks)
December 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER pursuant to the discussion during the telephone conference held December 16, 2014, the Court grants defendants until January 12, 2015, to file a supplement to their motion for sanctions. Plaintiff is allowed fourteen days to file a response to defendants' supplement. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 12/17/2014. (jak)
August 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 165 OPINION AND ORDER denying 131 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 8/27/2014. (ks)
January 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER denying 57 Motion for Extension of Discovery; denying 92 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/23/2014. (ks)
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER denying 74 and 77 motions for summary judgments and denying 73 motion for bifurcated trial on the issue of punitive damages. The Court will schedule a hearing on defendants' motion for extension of time to complete discovery and plaintiff's motion in limine. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/13/2014. (ks)
September 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by West Plains Bank & Trust Company. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/26/12. (vjt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones et al v. West Plains Bank & Trust Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Lynn Jones
Represented By: Scott Manatt
Represented By: Gary N. Speed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Skunk Deville Music
Represented By: Scott Manatt
Represented By: Gary N. Speed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Plains Bank & Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?