Brown v. Cowell et al

Plaintiff: Billy Wayne Brown, Jr
Defendant: Richard Guy, Christopher Budnik, Billy Cowell, Jennifer Horn, Wendy Kelly, Ray Hobbs and John Maples
Case Number: 1:2012cv00087
Filed: September 4, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Jackson
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 7, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 34 MOTION to Compel filed by Jennifer Horn, Billy Cowell. Plaintiff shall file his response within 10 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 3/7/13. (kpr)
November 30, 2012 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 7 the proposed findings and partial recommended disposition; and dismissing Defendants Wendy Kelly and Ray Hobbs from this action with prejudice. It is certified that an in forma pauperis appeal taken from this action is considered frivolous and not in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/30/2012. (kdr)
October 11, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons for defts Cowell, Horn, Maples, Budnik and Guy. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve summons and the Amended Complaint on defts Maples, Budnik and Guy in care of the ADC Compliance Office. The summons on defts Cowell and Horn should be served on them in care of Humphries & Lewis Law Firm. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/11/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Cowell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Guy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Budnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billy Cowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Maples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Wayne Brown, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?