Mitchell v. Arkansas Department of Correction

Plaintiff: Kevin Martin Mitchell, Sr
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Correction
Case Number: 1:2013cv00092
Filed: October 21, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 31, 2015 38 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with the 37 Order that was entered on this day, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this case is dismissed without prejudice. The relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 3/31/2015. (ks)
May 5, 2014 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING AND ADOPTING 11 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDED PARTIAL DISPOSITION in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects; dismissing Plaintiff's claim against ADC with prejudice; dismissing Plaintiff's claim a gainst Doss without prejudice. Mr. Martin may proceed with his inadequate medical care claim against defendant King. The Clerk of the Court is directed to prepare a summons for defendant K. King; the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve the summons, c omplaint, amended complaint and this Order on her through the Humphries and Odum law firm without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor. An in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 05/05/2014. (rhm)
January 28, 2014 8 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL ORDER FOR Pro Se Prisoners. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 01/28/2014. (kcs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell v. Arkansas Department of Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Martin Mitchell, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?