Rushing v. Guy et al

Plaintiff: Ricky Lee Rushing
Defendant: Guy, Marvin Evans, Jr, Chris Goforth, Brenda Bridgeman, Billy Cowell, R Hennessey, Middleton, J Maples and Darland
Case Number: 1:2014cv00028
Filed: April 16, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 29, 2015 142 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 141 Order entered in this matter on this date, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this case be, and it is hereby, dismissed. The relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 12/29/2015. (rhm)
November 18, 2015 138 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 104 Proposed Findings and Recommendations in their entirety; dismissing without prejudice for failure to prosecute plaintiff Ricky Lee Rushing's claims against Mr. Jones; and denying as moot Mr. Jones's 78 motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 11/18/2015. (rhm)
June 8, 2015 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting in their entirety 87 Proposed Findings and Recommendations and denying 81 motion for preliminary injunction and temporary restraining order, which this Court construes as a motion for preliminary injunction.
March 10, 2015 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare summons for Defendants Marvin Evans Jr., and Mr. Jones. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve a copy of the Third Amended Complaint and Supplement, 21 and 70 , and summons on Defendant Evans in car e of the Arkansas Board of Correction and Community Punishment Compliance Division and Defendant Mr. Jones in care of Humphries, Odum, and Eubanks Law Firm without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 3/10/2015. (jak)
March 6, 2015 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting in part 19 Recommendation; adopting in its entirety 45 Recommendation; declining to adopt 67 Recommendation; denying 5 15 motion for preliminary injunctions. Defendants Mr. Goforth, Ms. Bridgeman, Middleton, Mr. Goforth, Mr. Williams, J. Stone, Pickerin, and Mr. Langston are dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. The Clerk of the Court is directed to file Docket Number 29 as a supplement to Mr. Rushing's third amended complaint and to update the docket to reflect Mr. Rushing's current address: 209 Capps Road, Judsonia, AR 72081. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 3/6/2015. (ks)
August 26, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare summons for the Defendant Ryon Hennessey and directing the US Marshal to serve a copy of the summons and 21 Third Amended Complaint on Defendant at the address provided under seal, without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 08/26/2014. (rhm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rushing v. Guy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Lee Rushing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvin Evans, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Goforth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Bridgeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billy Cowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Hennessey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Middleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Maples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?