Murphy v. Faust et al

Plaintiff: Lisa R Murphy
Defendant: Blair, K Wayley, G Cox, Weekley, N Faust and Linda Dixon
Case Number: 1:2014cv00062
Filed: June 5, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 12, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to mail Murphy the docket sheet for this case and the September 4, 2014 screening Opinion and Order 5 . If Murphy wishes to continue to pursue any or all of those claims, she must file within thirty days of the entry of thi s Order a Motion to Reopen that labeled Murphy v. Faust, No. 1:14CV00062 JLH and clearly state which claims she wishes to pursue. If Murphy does not timely and properly do so, her motion to withdraw will be denied and this case will remain closed. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/12/2014. (jak)
November 10, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 21 Order entered separately today, this case is voluntarily dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/10/2014. (ks)
September 4, 2014 5 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to change Defendant Wayley's name to "Kelly D. Whaley." Murphy may proceed with her failure to protect, corrective inaction, and failure to train claims against Faust, Weekley, Whaley, and Dixon. All other claims and defendants are dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk is directed to prepare a summons for Faust, Weekley, Whaley, and Dixon. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve the summons, complaint, amended complaint, and this Opinion and Order on them through the ADC Compliance Office without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/4/2014. (ks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murphy v. Faust et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K Wayley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weekley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N Faust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa R Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?