Johnson v. Baker et al

Plaintiff: Wilbert Lezell Johnson
Defendant: Baker, Banister, Faust, Banks, Evans, Naylor, Lawrence and Griffin
Case Number: 1:2015cv00081
Filed: July 15, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 16, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 38 the proposed findings and recommended disposition; directing the clerk to correct the docket to reflect defendant "Baker" is "Clinton Baker;" granting 33 Defendants' motion for summary judgment and dismi ssing, with prejudice, defendants Clinton Baker, Terrie Bannister, Banks, Raymond Naylor, and Jada Lawrence; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal from this order and the accompanying judgment would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/16/2016. (kdr)
November 20, 2015 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's motion to compel 27 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 11/20/2015. (lej)
November 16, 2015 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting the 24 proposed findings and partial recommended disposition in all respects and denying 23 Johnson's motion for declaratory judgment and injunctive relief. It is certified that an in forma pauperis appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/16/2015. (rhm)
October 7, 2015 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 10 the proposed findings and partial recommended disposition; dismissing, without prejudice, Defendants Faust, Evans, and Griffin; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/7/2015. (kdr)
September 3, 2015 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 6 the proposed findings and recommended disposition as to all claims except for Johnson's due process claim; allowing Plaintiff's due process claim based on his allegation that he was not permitted to attend the hearing lea ding to his disciplinary confinement to proceed; dismissing, without prejudice, Plaintiff's remaining claims; remanding this case to the magistrate judge for further proceedings consistent with this order; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/3/2015. (kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Baker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilbert Lezell Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Faust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?