Knox v. Kelley et al

Plaintiff: Christopher George Knox
Defendant: Wendy Kelley, Jae Page, Howard, Ricky Davis, Bruce Golden, Nicholas Naracon, Raylina Ramsey, Olivia Okai, Antonio Garcia, Tipton and Does
Case Number: 1:2015cv00086
Filed: August 10, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Jackson
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 10, 2016 105 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with the 104 Order that was entered on this day, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this case is hereby dismissed, without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 5/10/2016. (ljb)
February 1, 2016 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REJECTING 64 Partial Recommended Disposition: the Court concludes that the Recommendation should be rejected base upon the evidence presented by the ADC Defendants in the objections Based on the newly presented evidence, the grievance proces s was available, yet Mr. Knox failed to utilize it. The ADC's 25 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. Mr. Knox's claims against Defendant Howard are DISMISSED, without prejudice, based on his failure to exhaust his administrative r emedies. His retaliatory discipline claims against Golden and Davis are DISMISSED, without prejudice, based on his failure to exhaust his administrative remedies. The ADC Defendants' 51 Second Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. Mr. Knox&# 039;s claims against Defendant Ramsey are DISMISSED, without prejudice, based on his failure to exhaust administrative remedies. Mr. Knox's failure-to-protect claims against Defendants Naracon and Garcia, as well as his deliberate-indifference claims against Defendants Golden and Davis are DISMISSED, without prejudice, based upon his failure to exhaust administrative remedies. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 2/1/2016. (mcz)
October 8, 2015 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 7 Partial Recommended Disposition. The Court concludes that the Recommendation should be approved and adopted as this Court's findings in all respects except for the dismissal of Defendant Ramsey. Mr. Knox may amend his Complaint on or before 10/20/2015, to add the allegations regarding Defendant Ramsey. Mr. Knox's claims against Defendants Kelley, Banks, and Page are DISMISSED, without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 10/8/2015. (mcz)
October 2, 2015 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to prepare summonses for Defendants Bridgeman and Canard. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve copies of the complaint and the amended complaint, with any attachments, 2 and 5 , and summonses for these Defendants without requiring prepayment of fees and costs or security. The Clerk of the Court also is instructed to update the docket sheet to reflect the correct identities of the Doe Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 10/2/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knox v. Kelley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher George Knox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jae Page
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricky Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Naracon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raylina Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olivia Okai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonio Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tipton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?