Clark v. Haydon et al

Plaintiff: Krisna Clark
Defendant: Haydon, Hall and Tiffany
Case Number: 1:2015cv00096
Filed: September 11, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Izard
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 15, 2015 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Clerk shall prepare summons and the USM serve Defendant Haydon without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 10/15/2015. (lej)
September 29, 2015 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Clerk shall alter the docket to reflect that Defendant "Doe" is appropriately Defendant "Tiffany." The Clerk shall prepare summons and the USM shall serve Defendant Tiffany without prepayment of fees or costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 9/29/2015. (lej)
September 14, 2015 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Clerk shall prepare summons and the USM is directed to serve Defendants Haydon and Hall without prepayment of fees or costs or security therefore. Within 30 days of this order's entry, Plaintiff should provide the identifying information for Defendant Doe which this order specifies. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 9/14/2015. (lej)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. Haydon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krisna Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haydon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffany
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?