Knox v. Richards

Plaintiff: Christopher George Knox
Defendant: Richards
Case Number: 1:2015cv00097
Filed: September 14, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 25, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with the 39 Order that was entered on this day, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this case is dismissed without prejudice. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 4/25/2016. (ljb)
December 1, 2015 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting 28 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects; denying Plaintiff's 6 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 12/1/2015. (ljb)
September 15, 2015 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Clerk shall prepare summons and the USM shall serve Defendant Richards without prepayment of fees or costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 9/15/2015. (lej)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knox v. Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher George Knox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richards
Represented By: Michelle Banks Odum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?