Elmore v. Correct Care Solutions et al

Plaintiff: Jeffery Charels Elmore
Defendant: Correct Care Solutions, Marty Hearyman, Ellisabeth Hayden, Rory Griffin, Robert Floss, Stephen Williams and Wendy Kelly
Case Number: 1:2015cv00111
Filed: October 2, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Izard
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 3, 2017 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 86 Recommended Disposition. Mr. Elmore's lawsuit is dismissed, with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 1/3/2017. (mcz)
July 20, 2016 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 70 Partial Recommended Disposition. Mr. Elmore's 51 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. Defendants' 56 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; Mr. Elmore's claims agains t Defendant Hearyman are limited to Defendant Hearyman's treatment of Mr. Elmore's stomach complaints from 6/25/2015 until 9/15/2015; Mr. Elmore's claims against Defendant Hayden are limited in time from 6/30/2015 until 7/14/2015; and the claims against Defendants Stieve and Floss are DISMISSED, without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 7/20/2016. (mcz)
February 9, 2016 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 43 Partial Report and Recommendations. Mr. Elmore's claims against Rory Griffin, Wendy Kelley and Stephen Williams are DISMISSED, without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 2/9/2016. (mcz)
December 1, 2015 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting 11 Partial Recommended Disposition as this Court's findings in all respects in its entirety; and dismissing, without prejudice, Mr. Elmore's claim against Correct Care Solutions. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 12/1/2015. (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elmore v. Correct Care Solutions et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery Charels Elmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correct Care Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marty Hearyman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellisabeth Hayden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rory Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Floss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?