Finley v. Baumgardner et al

Plaintiff: Claude Edward Finley
Defendant: J Baumgardner, M Smith, Eddie Selvey and Wendy Kelley
Case Number: 1:2015cv00131
Filed: December 18, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Izard
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 5, 2016 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting the 51 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition as this Court's findings in all respects; granting Defendants' 43 Motion for Summary Judgment; dismissing without prejudice plaintiff's claims against Defendants Selvey and Smith for failure to exhaust administrative remedies; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 8/5/2016. (ljb)
February 24, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons and the USM to serve Defendant Selvey without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 2/24/2016. (lej)
February 9, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 17 Partial Report and Recommendations. Defendant Wendy Kelley is DISMISSED without prejudice due to Plaintiff's failure to state an actionable claim against her. Plaintiff's claims for declaratory judgment are DISMISSED without prejudice. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 2/9/2016. (mcz)
January 25, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Clerk prepare summonses for Defendants Baumgardner, Smith, and Selvey and the USM is directed to serve these Defendants without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 1/25/2016. (lej)
January 11, 2016 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that if Plaintiff wishes to amend his complaint, he may complete the new complaint form in its entirety in accordance with this order, mark it as "Amended Complaint", and file it within 21 days of the date of this order. This action w ill proceed solely on the content of his original complaint 2 if Plaintiff elects not to file an amended complaint within the allotted time. His various Addendums and any claims raised therein will not be considered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 1/11/2016. (lej)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Finley v. Baumgardner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claude Edward Finley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Baumgardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eddie Selvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?