Tillery v. Kelley et al

Plaintiff: Tammy Tillery
Defendant: Wendy Lynne Kelley, Dexter L Payne, Stephen D Williams and Billy W Inman
Case Number: 1:2016cv00069
Filed: June 16, 2016
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 22, 2016 73 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: The Court finds in favor of the ADC Defendants on all claims. Tillery's complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/22/2016. (jak)
December 6, 2016 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 52 Motion for Marshal service of four subpoenas. 53 Motion is granted. Discovery closed a month ago, but the effort involved in responding is de minimus; this person may indeed have relevant knowledge; and the Court declines to decide now exactly who may testify about what. Please provide the name, by email, by 12/7/2016. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/6/2016. (jak)
November 22, 2016 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 45 Motion for a transport order. The Court directs the Arkansas Department of Correction to ensure the attendance of witness, Matthew Tillery (ADC #134761), North Central Unit, 10 Prison Circle, Calico Rock, Arkansas, 72519 to testif y at the trial of this matter at 9:00 a.m. on 12/20/2016 in Courtroom 1A for each day of trial until he is no longer needed or is dismissed by the Court. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/22/2016. (jak) (Docket text modified on 11/22/2016 to correct the typographical error).(jak)
November 21, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The parties indicated they may call an inmate witness, Matthew Tillery. The ADC defendants must file with the Court Tillery's full name, ADC number, and location for a transport order by 11/30/2016. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/21/2016. (jak)
November 15, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 40 Motion to submit another joint report. Tillery's embedded request for a hearing, 40 , is denied. No hearing is needed. Each side's papers contain an embedded request to impose sanctions and those are also denied. The Court is studying the discovery dispute described in the 39 Joint Report and will address it in a separate order. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1115/2016. (jak)
October 14, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER noting 37 Joint Report. The Court waives the in-person consultation requirement given the distance. The parties' joint report is clear and thorough; there's no need for a hearing. The ADC defendants' initial disclosures are ade quate. The imminent responses to Tillery's pending discovery should provide her sufficient information and documents. Tillery's request for an unsupervised trial preparation meeting with her husband is overruled. An ADC guard must be presen t but at a distance and out of earshot of normal conversation. Tillery's request to personally videotape any deposition is overruled. Tillery's request to inspect various prison premises and observe various ADC operations is denied; and the notice of entry on land is quashed. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/14/2016. (jak)
September 27, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 29 Motion for Clarification. Denying without prejudice 30 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/27/2016. (jak)
September 13, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: For the reasons stated on the record at the status conference on 9/8/2016, the Court resolves the discovery disputes as stated in this Order. If Mrs. Tillery decides to file for in forma pauperis status, she may do so under seal. The Court adopts the parties' proposed discovery schedule, expedited discovery response times, and electronic service obligations, 21 . Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/13/2016. (jak)
September 8, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing the status conference to 3:30 p.m. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/8/2016. (jak)
August 22, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Motion for emergency conference, 18 . denied. Motion to expedite, 19 , denied as moot. Rule 26(f) report due by 9/2/2016. Status conference at 1:30 p.m. on 9/8/2016 in courtroom B155 at the Richard S. Arnold U.S. Courthouse, 500 W. Capitol Avenue, Little Rock, Arkansas 72201. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/22/2016. (jak)
August 12, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 9 motion for temporary restraining order; granting 12 defendants' motion for extension; and granting 14 Tillery's motion to expedite. Defendants' must file any response to 9 motion for preliminary injunction by 9/12/2016. The Court sets a one-day consolidated preliminary injunction hearing/trial on the merits for 12/20/2016. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/12/2016. (thd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tillery v. Kelley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Tillery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Lynne Kelley
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dexter L Payne
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen D Williams
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billy W Inman
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?