Clark v. Robertson et al
Plaintiff: Seyoum Ali Clark
Defendant: Bradley Howard Robertson, Baker, S Armstrong, Finney, Mitchell Jones, Reichard and Johnny M Morris
Case Number: 1:2016cv00083
Filed: July 11, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Batesville Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: Patricia S. Harris
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER adopting in their entirety 104 the proposed findings and recommendations; denying 87 88 motions for summary judgment; granting 95 defendants' motion for summary judgment; denying 105 Clark's motion to dismiss; and dismissing Clark's amended complaint with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/1/2018. (kdr)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER adopting in their entirety 68 the findings and partial recommendation; granting 43 defendants Mitchell Jones's and Robert Reichard's motion for summary judgment; dismissing without prejudice Clark's claims against Jones and Reichard, for failure to exhaust; and further certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/22/2018. (kdr)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER adopting in their entirety 62 the proposed findings and recommendation; and denying 54 the defendants' motion to dismiss for lack of prosecution. A new scheduling order will follow. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/27/2017. (kdr)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER adopting in their entirety 41 the findings and recommendations; granting 32 the motion to dismiss; dismissing defendants Correct Care Solutions and Shelia Armstrong; and denying 39 the motion for judgment on the pleadings submitted by defendants Clinton Baker, Thomas Finney, Johnny Morris, and Bradley Robertson. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/9/2017. (kdr)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER adopting in their entirety 16 the proposed findings and recommendations; and dismissing with prejudice Clark's claims against the Arkansas Department of Corrections. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/2/2017. (kdr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. Robertson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seyoum Ali Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley Howard Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Finney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reichard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnny M Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?