Scott v. Arkansas Department of Correction et al
Plaintiff: Mondrea Renee' Scott
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Correction, James Bank, Darryl Golden and Dexter Payne
Case Number: 1:2016cv00086
Filed: July 13, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Batesville Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Presiding Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER approving and adopting 80 Recommended Disposition as this Court's findings in all respects; denying 52 , 60 Ms. Scott's motion for summary judgment; and denying 69 Mr. Banks and Mr. Golden's motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 3/25/2019. (cmn)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER adopting 51 the Recommended Partial Disposition; granting 36 defendants' motion for partial summary judgment and dismissing without prejudice Ms. Scott's claims against separate defendant Mr. Payne; and allowing Ms. Scott to proceed with her due process and equal protection claims against separate defendants James Banks and Darryl Golden, in their individual capacities at this time. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/31/2018. (kdr)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER adopting the 6 , 23 Recommendations in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects; allowing Ms. Scott to proceed with her due process and equal protection claims against separate defendants James Banks, Darryl Golden, and Dexter Payne in their individual capacities; dismissing with prejudice Ms. Scott's claims against Mr. Banks, Mr. Golden, and Mr. Payne in their official capacities; dismissing with prejudice Ms. Scott's claims against separate defendant ADC; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/16/2017. (mef)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Arkansas Department of Correction et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mondrea Renee' Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darryl Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dexter Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?