Brown v. McCormick et al
Plaintiff: Lester Brown
Defendant: Cody M McCormick and James Hill
Case Number: 1:2016cv00168
Filed: December 14, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Batesville Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 148 JUDGMENT: The Court withdraws the reference. Brown's claims against Cowell and Amplo are dismissed without prejudice. All other claims are dismissed with prejudice based on the parties' settlement. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/8/2019. (jbh)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER adopting 84 Partial Recommendation. Brown's amended motion for summary judgment, No. 78 , is denied. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/14/2017. (jak)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER adopting 45 Partial Recommendation. Defendants' motion and amended motion to dismiss, 19 & 27 , construed as a motion for summary judgment, are denied. The Court on de novo review adopts the 59 Partial Recommendation and overrules Brown's 60 & 66 objections. Brown's 51 Motion for Summary Judgment is denied. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/2/2017. (jak)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER adopting 5 Recommendation. Brown's false-disciplinary claim and his claims against Cowell and Amplo are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/10/2017. (jak)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. McCormick et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lester Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cody M McCormick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?