Ware v. Kelley

Plaintiff: Carvin Ware
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Case Number: 1:2018cv00069
Filed: September 6, 2018
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
0 Judge: Patricia S Harris
1 Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2018 8 RESPONSE to #5 Motion to Dismiss filed by Carvin Ware. (kdr)
October 18, 2018 7 RESPONSE to #5 Motion to Dismiss filed by Carvin Ware. (kdr)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order 6 ORDER: The Court accords Ware an opportunity to file a response to Kelley's motion to dismiss. Ware is given up to, and including, 11/12/2018, to file his response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 10/12/2018. (ljb)
October 4, 2018 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #5 Motion to Dismiss. CORRECTION: The docket entry was modified to correct the filing event as "MOTION to Dismiss" as marked on the document. (jak)
October 3, 2018 5 MOTION to Dismiss #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Wendy Kelley. (Attachments: #1 Document Brief in Support Motion to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus)(Eanes, David) (Docket entry modified on 10/4/2018 to correct the filing event)(jak)
September 18, 2018 4 NOTICE of Appearance by David L. Eanes, Jr on behalf of Wendy Kelley (Eanes, David)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order 3 ORDER granting #1 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis; and directing the Clerk of the Court to serve a copy of #2 Ware's petition and this order on respondent Wendy Kelley and the Arkansas Attorney General by regular mail. Respondent shall file an answer, motion, or other response within 21 days after service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 9/10/2018. (ljb)
September 6, 2018 2 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Carvin Ware. (cel)
September 6, 2018 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Carvin Ware. (cel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ware v. Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carvin Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Represented By: David L. Eanes, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?