Winston v. Bruce et al
Plaintiff: Tristan C Winston
Defendant: Stephen L Bruce and Stephen L Bruce PC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00021
Filed: March 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Tristan C Winston. (McGaha, Corey)
May 29, 2019 Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 8/5/2019. Rule 26(f) Report due by 8/19/2019. Jury Trial set for 5/26/2020 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # A401 before Judge Billy Roy Wilson. Entered at the direction of the Court on 5/29/19. (mmb)
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #5 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Stephen L Bruce, Stephen L Bruce PC. (Fricke, G.)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Stephen L Bruce, Stephen L Bruce PC (Fricke, G.)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by G. Spence Fricke on behalf of Stephen L Bruce, Stephen L Bruce PC (Fricke, G.)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint , filed by Tristan C Winston. Stephen L Bruce PC served on 5/8/2019. (McGaha, Corey)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint , filed by Tristan C Winston. Stephen L Bruce served on 5/8/2019. (McGaha, Corey)
March 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Tristan C Winston. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT071397.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winston v. Bruce et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen L Bruce
Represented By: G. Spence Fricke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen L Bruce PC
Represented By: G. Spence Fricke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tristan C Winston
Represented By: William Thomas Crowder
Represented By: Corey Darnell McGaha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?