Friar v. Newport Police Deparment et al

Plaintiff: Ernest Terrell Friar, Jr
Defendant: Cheris Engler, Kyle Whisenhunt, Newport Police Deparment, Matt Duvall and Bill Borie
Case Number: 1:2019cv00040
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Referring Judge: Joe J Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 11 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Ernest Terrell Friar Jr re #8 Order adopting Proposed Findings and Recommended Disposition, #9 Judgment, #10 Appellate Filing Fee Notice. (fjg)
June 25, 2019 Filing 10 APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (jbh)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the #8 order filed this date, judgment is entered dismissing this case without prejudice; the relief sought is denied. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal is considered frivolous and not in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 6/25/2019. (jbh)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER adopting #6 Proposed Findings and Recommended Disposition; dismissing without prejudice #1 Plaintiff's Complaint; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order adopting the recommendation and the accompanying Judgment would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 6/25/2019. (jbh)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Ernest Terrell Friar Jr re #6 Proposed Findings and Recommendations. (fjg)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS that Plaintiff's complaint be dismissed without prejudice #1 . The Court certify, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from any order adopting these recommendations and the accompanying judgment would not be taken in good faith. Objections due no later than 14 days from the date of the findings and recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 6/10/2019. (lej)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying Plaintiff's Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit #2 . Plaintiff must submit the statutory filing fee of $400 to the Clerk, noting the above case style and number, within 14 days of the date of this order if he wishes to proceed with this action. Failure to do so will result in the dismissal of this action without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 5/20/2019. (lej)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 Case electronically transferred in from District of Arkansas Western; Case Number 5:19-cv-05094. Electronic file copy of transfer order, case file, and docket sheet received.
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Eastern District of Arkansas. Docket Sheet and case documents sent to receiving court. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann on May 17, 2019. (tg) [Transferred from arwd on 5/17/2019.]
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Ernest Terrell Friar, Jr. Motions referred to Erin L. Wiedemann.(tg) [Transferred from arwd on 5/17/2019.]
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) against Bill Borie, Matt Duvall, Cheris Engler, Newport Police Deparment, Kyle Whisenhunt, filed by Ernest Terrell Friar, Jr.(tg) [Transferred from arwd on 5/17/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Friar v. Newport Police Deparment et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheris Engler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Whisenhunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newport Police Deparment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Duvall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Borie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest Terrell Friar, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?