Best v. Consensus Orthopedics Inc et al
Plaintiff: Robert Best
Defendant: John Does and Consensus Orthopedics Inc
Case Number: 1:2019cv00046
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Best. Consensus Orthopedics Inc served on 7/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Certified Mail Receipts)(Underwood, Richard)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court notifying party that #1 Complaint lacks an original signature (F.R.Cv.P. 11(a) and Local Rule 5.5(c)(1)). (thd)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Robert Best. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT072590.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/17/2019: #2 Main Document - Correct (submitted 6/17/2019)) (cmn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Best v. Consensus Orthopedics Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consensus Orthopedics Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Best
Represented By: Richard D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?