Oakley v. Howard et al
Plaintiff: Claude B Oakley
Defendant: Toni Bradley, GoForthe, Wendy Kelley, Jerry L Howard, II, DeAngelo Earl and Aaron Rodger
Case Number: 1:2019cv00048
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Referring Judge: J Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 8 APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (ljb)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 JUDGMENT: Consistent with #6 Order entered separately today, this case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 7/8/2019. (ljb)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER approving and adopting in its entirety #5 Recommendation as this Court's findings in all respects; dismissing with prejudice #2 Complaint for failing to state a claim upon which relief may be granted; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order and accompanying Judgment would not be taken in good faith. Dismissal is a "strike", pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 7/8/2019. (ljb)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION recommending Oakley's #2 Complaint be dismissed with prejudice; the dismissal of this case be counted as a "strike"; the Court certify that an in forma pauperis appeal from any Order adopting this Recommendation would not be taken in good faith; Objections due within 14 days of the date of this recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 6/18/19. (tjb)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS granting #1 #3 IFP motions; directing monthly payments be collected from Plaintiff's institutional account and forwarded to the Clerk, until a total of $350 has been paid; and directing the Clerk to send a copy of this Order to the Warden of the Grimes Unit and the appropriate ADC offices. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 6/14/2019. (kdr)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Claude B Oakley. (kdr)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Claude B Oakley.(kdr)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Claude B Oakley. (kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oakley v. Howard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toni Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GoForthe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry L Howard, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeAngelo Earl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Rodger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claude B Oakley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?